Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session

Massachusetts Senate Bill S2698 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2024

                            1 of 2
SENATE DOCKET, NO. 3062       FILED 	ON: 3/7/2024
SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 2698
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR
COMMONWEALTH 	OF MASSACHUSETTS
STATE HOUSE · BOSTON, MA 02133
(617) 725-4000
MAURA T. HEALEY
GOVERNOR
KIMBERLEY DRISCOLL
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
March 7, 2024
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives,
Pursuant to the provisions of Article II, Section 8, Paragraph 1, Clause (2) of the 
Amendments to the Constitution, as appearing in Article LXXXIX of said Amendments, I am 
filing for your consideration the attached legislation entitled, An Act validating the results of the 
annual election held in the town of Whitman on May 20, 2023.
I am filing this special legislation at the request of the Town of Whitman’s Board of 
Selectmen, who unanimously voted to request this legislation at a meeting held on October 30, 
2023. 
 
The legislation ratifies all acts and proceedings taken by the Town at its annual town 
election held on May 20, 2023. The ratification serves to resolve any question that might arise 
from the fact that the warrant for the election inadvertently omitted the text of a Proposition 2 ½ 
ballot question which passed by a vote of 772-366.  Through that ballot question, the voters of 
Whitman approved a measure to issue bonds to pay for a new building for the Town’s 
Department of Public Works. Since the vote was invalidated, the bonding cannot occur, and the 
Town of Whitman reports that it will lose financing for the project if bonding is not approved 
promptly.         
Although the warrant for the election inadvertently omitted the text of the ballot question, 
the full text of the question was properly printed on the ballot and posted at least 7 days prior to 
the election. Timely ratification of the results of the election is necessary to permit the Town to  2 of 2
proceed with issuing the bond and begin the construction project. I therefore urge your prompt 
consideration of this bill.
Respectfully submitted,
Maura T. Healey,
Governor 1 of 1
SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 2698
Senate, March 11, 2024 -- 	Message from Her Excellency the Governor (pursuant to the 
provisions of Article II, Section 8, Paragraph 1, Clause (2) of the Amendments to the 
Constitution, as appearing in Article LXXXIX of said Amendments) recommending legislation 
to validate the results of the annual election held in the town of Whitman on May 20, 2023
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Third General Court
(2023-2024)
_______________
An Act validating the results of the annual election held in the town of Whitman on May 20, 
2023.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. Notwithstanding any general or special law to the contrary, all acts and 
2proceedings taken by the town of Whitman at the annual town election held on May 20, 2023 
3and all actions taken pursuant thereto are hereby ratified, validated and confirmed, 
4notwithstanding any failure to include the form of the proposition two and one-half, so-called, 
5debt exclusion question in 	the posted warrants for said election.
6 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon its passage.