Senate | 07/31/2024 | New draft substituted (Finegold), see S2916 | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Read third | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 07/24/2024 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 07/24/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee | ||
Joint | 06/24/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 | ||
House | 06/17/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |