08/13/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 181 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 08/08/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 08/08/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 08/08/2024 | Emergency preamble adopted | ||
Senate | 08/05/2024 | Senate concurred in the House amendment | ||
House | 08/05/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 08/01/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 08/01/2024 | Ordered to the third reading | ||
House | 08/01/2024 | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted | ||
House | 08/01/2024 | Read second | ||
House | 08/01/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending | ||
House | 08/01/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | ||
House | 08/01/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting the text of H4971 | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | New draft (Finegold) for S2819 |