House | 10/03/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 10/03/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 10/03/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 09/19/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/16/2024 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 09/16/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Joint | 08/06/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 08/09/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 08/05/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 07/30/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |