Senate | 12/16/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 12/16/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 12/16/2024 | Emergency preamble adopted | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 12/09/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 11/27/2024 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 11/27/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee | ||
House | 11/25/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service | ||
Senate | 10/31/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |