Senate | 04/08/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Accompanied by H967 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Joint | 10/16/2023 | Hearing rescheduled to 10/17/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual | ||
Joint | 10/03/2023 | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual | ||
Joint | 10/03/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |