1 | 1 | | 1 of 1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3850 FILED ON: 1/17/2025 |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 2107 |
---|
4 | 4 | | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
---|
5 | 5 | | _________________ |
---|
6 | 6 | | PRESENTED BY: |
---|
7 | 7 | | Carmine Lawrence Gentile and Daniel M. Donahue |
---|
8 | 8 | | _________________ |
---|
9 | 9 | | To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General |
---|
10 | 10 | | Court assembled: |
---|
11 | 11 | | The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill: |
---|
12 | 12 | | An Act relative to raising the minimum wage closer to a living wage in the commonwealth. |
---|
13 | 13 | | _______________ |
---|
14 | 14 | | PETITION OF: |
---|
15 | 15 | | NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Carmine Lawrence Gentile13th Middlesex1/17/2025Daniel M. Donahue16th Worcester1/17/2025James C. Arena-DeRosa8th Middlesex2/11/2025Christine P. Barber34th Middlesex1/28/2025Manny Cruz7th Essex2/4/2025James B. EldridgeMiddlesex and Worcester2/10/2025Danillo A. Sena37th Middlesex1/31/2025 1 of 4 |
---|
16 | 16 | | HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3850 FILED ON: 1/17/2025 |
---|
17 | 17 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 2107 |
---|
18 | 18 | | By Representatives Gentile of Sudbury and Donahue of Worcester, a petition (accompanied by |
---|
19 | 19 | | bill, House, No. 2107) of Carmine Lawrence Gentile, Daniel M. Donahue and others relative to |
---|
20 | 20 | | raising the minimum wage. Labor and Workforce Development. |
---|
21 | 21 | | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
---|
22 | 22 | | _______________ |
---|
23 | 23 | | In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2025-2026) |
---|
25 | 25 | | _______________ |
---|
26 | 26 | | An Act relative to raising the minimum wage closer to a living wage in the commonwealth. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority |
---|
28 | 28 | | of the same, as follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | 1 SECTION 1. Section 1 of chapter 151 of the General Laws, as appearing in the 2022 |
---|
30 | 30 | | 2Official Edition, is hereby amended by striking out the word “It”, in line 1, and inserting in place |
---|
31 | 31 | | 3thereof the following words:- Notwithstanding the provisions of section 27C of chapter 29 or any |
---|
32 | 32 | | 4other general or special law to the contrary, it. |
---|
33 | 33 | | 5 SECTION 2. section 1 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by |
---|
34 | 34 | | 6inserting before the word “employer”, in line 2, the following words:- public or private. |
---|
35 | 35 | | 7 SECTION 3. Section 1 of chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby amended by striking out |
---|
36 | 36 | | 8the figure “$15.00” and inserting in place thereof the following figure:- $16.25. |
---|
37 | 37 | | 9 SECTION 4. Section 1 of chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by |
---|
38 | 38 | | 10striking out the figure “$16.25”, inserted by section 2, and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
39 | 39 | | 11following figure:- $17.50. 2 of 4 |
---|
40 | 40 | | 12 SECTION 5. Section 1 of chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by |
---|
41 | 41 | | 13striking out the figure “$17.50”, inserted by section 4, and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
42 | 42 | | 14following figure:- $18.75. |
---|
43 | 43 | | 15 SECTION 6. Section 1 of chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by |
---|
44 | 44 | | 16striking out the figure “$18.75”, inserted by section 5, and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
45 | 45 | | 17following figure:- $20.00. |
---|
46 | 46 | | 18 SECTION 7. Chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking section |
---|
47 | 47 | | 191 and inserting in place thereof the following section:- |
---|
48 | 48 | | 20 Section 1. (a) Notwithstanding the provisions of section 27C of chapter 29 or any other |
---|
49 | 49 | | 21general or special law to the contrary, it is hereby declared to be against public policy for any |
---|
50 | 50 | | 22public or private employer to employ any person in an occupation in this commonwealth at an |
---|
51 | 51 | | 23oppressive and unreasonable wage as defined in section 2, and any contract, agreement or |
---|
52 | 52 | | 24understanding for or in relation to such employment shall be null and void. Annually on |
---|
53 | 53 | | 25September 30 the executive office of labor and workforce development shall calculate an |
---|
54 | 54 | | 26adjusted minimum wage rate to maintain employee purchasing power by increasing the current |
---|
55 | 55 | | 27year's minimum wage rate by the rate of inflation. The adjusted minimum wage rate shall be |
---|
56 | 56 | | 28calculated to the nearest cent using the consumer price index for urban wage earners and clerical |
---|
57 | 57 | | 29workers or a successor index, for the 12 months prior to each September 1st as calculated by the |
---|
58 | 58 | | 30United States department of labor. Each adjusted minimum wage rate calculated under this |
---|
59 | 59 | | 31section shall take effect on the following January 1. 3 of 4 |
---|
60 | 60 | | 32 SECTION 8. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as appearing in the 2022 Official Edition, is |
---|
61 | 61 | | 33hereby amended by striking out, in line 33, the figure “$6.75” and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
62 | 62 | | 34following figure:- $7.92. |
---|
63 | 63 | | 35 SECTION 9. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by |
---|
64 | 64 | | 36striking out the figure “$7.92”, inserted by section 8, and inserting in place thereof the following |
---|
65 | 65 | | 37figure:- $9.19. |
---|
66 | 66 | | 38 SECTION 10. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended |
---|
67 | 67 | | 39by striking out the figure “$9.19”, inserted by section 9, and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
68 | 68 | | 40following figure:- $10.55. |
---|
69 | 69 | | 41 SECTION 11. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended |
---|
70 | 70 | | 42by striking out the figure “$10.55”, inserted by section 10, and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
71 | 71 | | 43following figure:- $12.00. |
---|
72 | 72 | | 44 SECTION 12. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended |
---|
73 | 73 | | 45by striking the figure “$12.00”, inserted by section 11, and inserting in place thereof the |
---|
74 | 74 | | 46following words:- “60 per cent of the minimum wage as determined by the executive office of |
---|
75 | 75 | | 47labor and workforce development pursuant to section 1 of this chapter”. |
---|
76 | 76 | | 48 SECTION 13. Section 3 and section 8 shall take effect on January 1, 2026. |
---|
77 | 77 | | 49 SECTION 14. Section 4 and section 9 shall take effect on January 1, 2027. |
---|
78 | 78 | | 50 SECTION 15. Section 5 and section 10 shall take effect on January 1, 2028. |
---|
79 | 79 | | 51 SECTION 16. Section 6 and section 11 shall take effect on January 1, 2029. 4 of 4 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 52 SECTION 17. Section 7 and section 12 shall take effect on January 1, 2030. |
---|
81 | 81 | | 53 SECTION 18. On September 30, 2029 the executive office of labor and workforce |
---|
82 | 82 | | 54development shall calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate to maintain employee purchasing |
---|
83 | 83 | | 55power by increasing the current year's minimum wage rate by the rate of inflation. The adjusted |
---|
84 | 84 | | 56minimum wage rate shall be calculated to the nearest cent using the consumer price index for |
---|
85 | 85 | | 57urban wage earners and clerical workers or a successor index, for the 12 months prior to |
---|
86 | 86 | | 58September 1, 2029 as calculated by the United States department of labor. The adjusted |
---|
87 | 87 | | 59minimum wage rate calculated under this section shall take effect on January 1, 2030. |
---|