Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H2107 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2025

                            1 of 1
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3850       FILED ON: 1/17/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 2107
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_________________
PRESENTED BY:
Carmine Lawrence Gentile and Daniel M. Donahue
_________________
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
Court assembled:
The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
An Act relative to raising the minimum wage closer to a living wage in the commonwealth.
_______________
PETITION OF:
NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Carmine Lawrence Gentile13th Middlesex1/17/2025Daniel M. Donahue16th Worcester1/17/2025James C. Arena-DeRosa8th Middlesex2/11/2025Christine P. Barber34th Middlesex1/28/2025Manny Cruz7th Essex2/4/2025James B. EldridgeMiddlesex and Worcester2/10/2025Danillo A. Sena37th Middlesex1/31/2025 1 of 4
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3850       FILED ON: 1/17/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 2107
By Representatives Gentile of Sudbury and Donahue of Worcester, a petition (accompanied by 
bill, House, No. 2107) of Carmine Lawrence Gentile, Daniel M. Donahue and others relative to 
raising the minimum wage. Labor and Workforce Development.
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
(2025-2026)
_______________
An Act relative to raising the minimum wage closer to a living wage in the commonwealth.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. Section 1 of chapter 151 of the General Laws, as appearing in the 2022 
2Official Edition, is hereby amended by striking out the word “It”, in line 1, and inserting in place 
3thereof the following words:- Notwithstanding the provisions of section 27C of chapter 29 or any 
4other general or special law to the contrary, it.
5 SECTION 2. section 1 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by 
6inserting before the word “employer”, in line 2, the following words:- public or private.
7 SECTION 3. Section 1 of chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby amended by striking out 
8the figure “$15.00” and inserting in place thereof the following figure:- $16.25.
9 SECTION 4. Section 1 of chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by 
10striking out the figure “$16.25”, inserted by section 2, and inserting in place thereof the 
11following figure:- $17.50. 2 of 4
12 SECTION 5. Section 1 of chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by 
13striking out the figure “$17.50”, inserted by section 4, and inserting in place thereof the 
14following figure:- $18.75.
15 SECTION 6. Section 1 of chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by 
16striking out the figure “$18.75”, inserted by section 5, and inserting in place thereof the 
17following figure:- $20.00.
18 SECTION 7. Chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking section 
191 and inserting in place thereof the following section:-
20 Section 1. (a) Notwithstanding the provisions of section 27C of chapter 29 or any other 
21general or special law to the contrary, it is hereby declared to be against public policy for any 
22public or private employer to employ any person in an occupation in this commonwealth at an 
23oppressive and unreasonable wage as defined in section 2, and any contract, agreement or 
24understanding for or in relation to such employment shall be null and void. Annually on 
25September 30 the executive office of labor and workforce development shall calculate an 
26adjusted minimum wage rate to maintain employee purchasing power by increasing the current 
27year's minimum wage rate by the rate of inflation. The adjusted minimum wage rate shall be 
28calculated to the nearest cent using the consumer price index for urban wage earners and clerical 
29workers or a successor index, for the 12 months prior to each September 1st as calculated by the 
30United States department of labor. Each adjusted minimum wage rate calculated under this 
31section shall take effect on the following January 1. 3 of 4
32 SECTION 8. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as appearing in the 2022 Official Edition, is 
33hereby amended by striking out, in line 33, the figure “$6.75” and inserting in place thereof the 
34following figure:- $7.92.
35 SECTION 9. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by 
36striking out the figure “$7.92”, inserted by section 8, and inserting in place thereof the following 
37figure:- $9.19.
38 SECTION 10. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended 
39by striking out the figure “$9.19”, inserted by section 	9, and inserting in place thereof the 
40following figure:- $10.55.
41 SECTION 11. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended 
42by striking out the figure “$10.55”, inserted by section 10, and inserting in place thereof the 
43following figure:- $12.00.
44 SECTION 12. Section 7 of said chapter 151, as so appearing, is hereby further amended 
45by striking the figure “$12.00”, inserted by section 11, and inserting in place thereof the 
46following words:- “60 per cent of the minimum wage as determined by the executive office of 
47labor and workforce development pursuant to section 1 of this chapter”.
48 SECTION 13. Section 3 and section 8 shall take effect on January 1, 2026.
49 SECTION 14. Section 4 and section 9 shall take effect on January 1, 2027.
50 SECTION 15. Section 5 and section 10 shall take effect on January 1, 2028.
51 SECTION 16. Section 6 and section 11 shall take effect on January 1, 2029. 4 of 4
52 SECTION 17. Section 7 and section 12 shall take effect on January 1, 2030.
53 SECTION 18. On September 30, 2029 the executive office of labor and workforce 
54development shall calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate to maintain employee purchasing 
55power by increasing the current year's minimum wage rate by the rate of inflation. The adjusted 
56minimum wage rate shall be calculated to the nearest cent using the consumer price index for 
57urban wage earners and clerical workers or a successor index, for the 12 months prior to 
58September 1, 2029 as calculated by the United States department of labor. The adjusted 
59minimum wage rate calculated under this section shall take effect on January 1, 2030.