1 | 1 | | 1 of 1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3975 FILED ON: 1/17/2025 |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3874 |
---|
4 | 4 | | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
---|
5 | 5 | | _________________ |
---|
6 | 6 | | PRESENTED BY: |
---|
7 | 7 | | Bridget Plouffe |
---|
8 | 8 | | _________________ |
---|
9 | 9 | | To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General |
---|
10 | 10 | | Court assembled: |
---|
11 | 11 | | The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill: |
---|
12 | 12 | | An Act relative to the Veterans’ Bonus Division. |
---|
13 | 13 | | _______________ |
---|
14 | 14 | | PETITION OF: |
---|
15 | 15 | | NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Bridget Plouffe9th Plymouth1/17/2025 1 of 4 |
---|
16 | 16 | | HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3975 FILED ON: 1/17/2025 |
---|
17 | 17 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3874 |
---|
18 | 18 | | By Representative Plouffe of Brockton, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 3874) of |
---|
19 | 19 | | Bridget Plouffe relative to the Veterans’ Bonus Division. Veterans and Federal Affairs. |
---|
20 | 20 | | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
---|
21 | 21 | | _______________ |
---|
22 | 22 | | In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2025-2026) |
---|
24 | 24 | | _______________ |
---|
25 | 25 | | An Act relative to the Veterans’ Bonus Division. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority |
---|
27 | 27 | | of the same, as follows: |
---|
28 | 28 | | 1 SECTION 1. Subsection (a) of section 78 of chapter 10 of the General Laws, as |
---|
29 | 29 | | 2appearing in the 2022 Official Edition, is hereby amended by inserting at the end thereof the |
---|
30 | 30 | | 3following words:- |
---|
31 | 31 | | 4 As used in this section, the term “Korean Emergency” shall mean the period on or after |
---|
32 | 32 | | 5June 25, 1950 to January 31, 1955. |
---|
33 | 33 | | 6 As used in this section, the term “Persian Gulf War” shall mean the period on or after |
---|
34 | 34 | | 7August 2, 1990 to April 10, 1991. |
---|
35 | 35 | | 8 As used in this section, the term “Vietnam Conflict” shall mean the period on or after |
---|
36 | 36 | | 9July 1, 1958 to May 17, 1975. |
---|
37 | 37 | | 10 As used in this section, the term “World War II” shall mean the period on or after |
---|
38 | 38 | | 11September 16, 1940 to July 25, 1947. 2 of 4 |
---|
39 | 39 | | 12 SECTION 2. Subparagraph (1) of subsection (b) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of |
---|
40 | 40 | | 13the General Laws, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by inserting after the word |
---|
41 | 41 | | 14“served”, in line 16, the following words:- “, or is currently serving,” |
---|
42 | 42 | | 15 SECTION 3. Subparagraph (1) of subsection (b) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of |
---|
43 | 43 | | 16the General Laws, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out, in lines 19 through |
---|
44 | 44 | | 1723, the words “have been in the commonwealth for a period of not less than 6 months before the |
---|
45 | 45 | | 18time of the person's entry into the service” and inserting in place thereof the following words:- |
---|
46 | 46 | | 19“be the commonwealth” |
---|
47 | 47 | | 20 SECTION 4. Subparagraph (5) of said subsection (b) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 |
---|
48 | 48 | | 21of the General Laws, as appearing in the 2022 Official Edition, is hereby amended by striking |
---|
49 | 49 | | 22 out, in line 44, the word “Medal” and inserting in place thereof the following words:- |
---|
50 | 50 | | 23“Medal, or equivalent Expeditionary Medal,” |
---|
51 | 51 | | 24 SECTION 5. Said subparagraph (5) of said subsection (b) of said section 78 of said |
---|
52 | 52 | | 25chapter 10 of the General Laws, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out, in |
---|
53 | 53 | | 26lines 48 through 52, the words “have been in the commonwealth for a period of not less than 6 |
---|
54 | 54 | | 27months immediately before the time of the person's entry into service” and inserting in place |
---|
55 | 55 | | 28thereof the following words:- be the commonwealth |
---|
56 | 56 | | 29 SECTION 6. Said subsection (b) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General |
---|
57 | 57 | | 30Laws, as so appearing is hereby further amended by inserting at the end thereof the following |
---|
58 | 58 | | 31subparagraph:- 3 of 4 |
---|
59 | 59 | | 32 (6) Upon application, as provided in this section and as specified in rules and regulations |
---|
60 | 60 | | 33established by the treasurer, there shall be allowed and paid out of the treasury of the |
---|
61 | 61 | | 34commonwealth, without appropriation, the sums specified in such rules and regulations to each |
---|
62 | 62 | | 35person who has served in the armed forces of the United States in active service as part of World |
---|
63 | 63 | | 36War II, the Korean Emergency, the Vietnam War or the Persian Gulf War; provided, however, |
---|
64 | 64 | | 37that the domicile of a person on account of whose service the application is filed shall be the |
---|
65 | 65 | | 38commonwealth; and provided further, that any veteran discharged or released under other than |
---|
66 | 66 | | 39honorable conditions due to sexual orientation, gender identity, gender expression or HIV status |
---|
67 | 67 | | 40based on the veteran's DD-214 form or equivalent documentation shall be eligible for a bonus |
---|
68 | 68 | | 41under this section. |
---|
69 | 69 | | 42 SECTION 7. Subsection (e) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General Laws, as |
---|
70 | 70 | | 43so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out the fifth and sixth sentences. |
---|
71 | 71 | | 44 SECTION 8. Subsection (e) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General Laws, as |
---|
72 | 72 | | 45so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out, in line 100, the word “section” and |
---|
73 | 73 | | 46inserting in place thereof the following word:- act |
---|
74 | 74 | | 47 SECTION 9. Subsection (e) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General Laws, as |
---|
75 | 75 | | 48so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out, in lines 106-107, the word “designed” |
---|
76 | 76 | | 49and inserting in place thereof the following word:- designated |
---|
77 | 77 | | 50 SECTION 10. Subsection (g) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General Laws, |
---|
78 | 78 | | 51as so appearing, is hereby further amended by inserting after the word “service”, in line X, the |
---|
79 | 79 | | 52following words:- “during the enlistment period” 4 of 4 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 53 SECTION 11. Chapter 731 of the acts of 1945, as amended by chapter 210 of the acts of |
---|
81 | 81 | | 541946, is hereby repealed. |
---|
82 | 82 | | 55 SECTION 12. Chapter 210 of the acts of 1946 is hereby repealed. |
---|
83 | 83 | | 56 SECTION 13. Chapter 581 of the acts of 1946, as amended by chapter 210 of the acts of |
---|
84 | 84 | | 571946, is hereby repealed. |
---|
85 | 85 | | 58 SECTION 14. Chapter 440 of the Acts of 1953 is hereby repealed. |
---|
86 | 86 | | 59 SECTION 15. Chapter 646 of the acts of 1968 is hereby repealed. |
---|
87 | 87 | | 60 SECTION 16. Chapter 325 of the acts of 1969 is hereby repealed. |
---|
88 | 88 | | 61 SECTION 17. Section 16 of chapter 130 of the acts of 2005 is hereby repealed. |
---|
89 | 89 | | 62 SECTION 18. Section 2 shall take effect on July 1, 2026. |
---|