Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H3874 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2025

                            1 of 1
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3975       FILED ON: 1/17/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3874
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_________________
PRESENTED BY:
Bridget Plouffe
_________________
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
Court assembled:
The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
An Act relative to the Veterans’ Bonus Division.
_______________
PETITION OF:
NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :DATE ADDED:Bridget Plouffe9th Plymouth1/17/2025 1 of 4
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 3975       FILED ON: 1/17/2025
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 3874
By Representative Plouffe of Brockton, a petition (accompanied by bill, House, No. 3874) of 
Bridget Plouffe relative to the Veterans’ Bonus Division. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
(2025-2026)
_______________
An Act relative to the Veterans’ Bonus Division.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. Subsection (a) of section 78 of chapter 10 of the General Laws, as 
2appearing in the 2022 Official Edition, is hereby amended by inserting at the end thereof the 
3following words:-
4 As used in this section, the term “Korean Emergency” shall mean the period on or after 
5June 25, 1950 to January 31, 1955.
6 As used in this section, the term “Persian Gulf War” shall mean the period on or after 
7August 2, 1990 to April 10, 1991.
8 As used in this section, the term “Vietnam Conflict” shall mean the period on or after 
9July 1, 1958 to May 17, 1975.
10 As used in this section, the term “World War II” shall mean the period on or after 
11September 16, 1940 to July 25, 1947. 2 of 4
12 SECTION 2. Subparagraph (1) of subsection (b) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of 
13the General Laws, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by inserting after the word 
14“served”, in line 16, the following words:- “, or is currently serving,”
15 SECTION 3. Subparagraph (1) of subsection (b) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of 
16the General Laws, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out, in lines 19 through 
1723, the words “have been in the commonwealth for a period of not less than 6 months before the 
18time of the person's entry into the service” and inserting in place thereof the following words:- 
19“be the commonwealth”
20 SECTION 4. Subparagraph (5) of said subsection (b) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 
21of the General Laws, as appearing in the 2022 Official Edition, is hereby amended by striking
22 out, in line 44, the word “Medal” and inserting in place thereof the following words:- 
23“Medal, or equivalent Expeditionary Medal,”
24 SECTION 5. Said subparagraph (5) of said subsection (b) of said section 78 of said 
25chapter 10 of the General Laws, as so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out, in 
26lines 48 through 52, the words “have been in the commonwealth for a period of not less than 6 
27months immediately before the time of the person's entry into service” and inserting in place 
28thereof the following words:- be the commonwealth
29 SECTION 6. Said subsection (b) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General 
30Laws, as so appearing is hereby further amended by inserting at the end thereof the following 
31subparagraph:- 3 of 4
32 (6) Upon application, as provided in this section and as specified in rules and regulations 
33established by the treasurer, there shall be allowed and paid out of the treasury of the 
34commonwealth, without appropriation, the sums specified in such rules and regulations to each 
35person who has served in the armed forces of the United States in active service as part of World 
36War II, the Korean Emergency, the Vietnam War or the Persian Gulf War; provided, however, 
37that the domicile of a person on account of whose service the application is filed shall be the 
38commonwealth; and provided further, that any veteran discharged or released under other than 
39honorable conditions due to sexual orientation, gender identity, gender expression or HIV status 
40based on the veteran's DD-214 form or equivalent documentation shall be eligible for a bonus 
41under this section.
42 SECTION 7. Subsection (e) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General Laws, as 
43so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out the fifth and sixth sentences.
44 SECTION 8. Subsection (e) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General Laws, as 
45so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out, in line 100, the word “section” and 
46inserting in place thereof the following word:- act
47 SECTION 9. Subsection (e) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General Laws, as 
48so appearing, is hereby further amended by striking out, in lines 106-107, the word “designed” 
49and inserting in place thereof the following word:- designated
50 SECTION 10. Subsection (g) of said section 78 of said chapter 10 of the General Laws, 
51as so appearing, is hereby further amended by inserting after the word “service”, in line X, the 
52following words:- “during the enlistment period” 4 of 4
53 SECTION 11. Chapter 731 of the acts of 1945, as amended by chapter 210 of the acts of 
541946, is hereby repealed.
55 SECTION 12. Chapter 210 of the acts of 1946 is hereby repealed.
56 SECTION 13. Chapter 581 of the acts of 1946, as amended by chapter 210 of the acts of 
571946, is hereby repealed.
58 SECTION 14. Chapter 440 of the Acts of 1953 is hereby repealed.
59 SECTION 15. Chapter 646 of the acts of 1968 is hereby repealed.
60 SECTION 16. Chapter 325 of the acts of 1969 is hereby repealed.
61 SECTION 17. Section 16 of chapter 130 of the acts of 2005 is hereby repealed.
62 SECTION 18. Section 2 shall take effect on July 1, 2026.