Massachusetts 2025-2026 Regular Session

Massachusetts Senate Bill S394 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1 of 1
22 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1237 FILED ON: 1/15/2025
33 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 394
44 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
55 _________________
66 PRESENTED BY:
77 Jason M. Lewis
88 _________________
99 To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General
1010 Court assembled:
1111 The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill:
1212 An Act increasing the Commonwealth's share of the education foundation budget.
1313 _______________
1414 PETITION OF:
1515 NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :Jason M. LewisFifth MiddlesexJoanne M. ComerfordHampshire, Franklin and Worcester2/4/2025Leigh Davis3rd Berkshire2/27/2025 1 of 3
1616 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1237 FILED ON: 1/15/2025
1717 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 394
1818 By Mr. Lewis, a petition (accompanied by bill, Senate, No. 394) of Jason M. Lewis, Joanne M.
1919 Comerford and Leigh Davis for legislation to increase the Commonwealth's share of the
2020 education foundation budget. Education.
2121 [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION
2222 SEE SENATE, NO. 303 OF 2023-2024.]
2323 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
2424 _______________
2525 In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court
2626 (2025-2026)
2727 _______________
2828 An Act increasing the Commonwealth's share of the education foundation budget.
2929 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority
3030 of the same, as follows:
3131 1 SECTION 1. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking
3232 2the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the
3333 3following:-
3434 4 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget
3535 5which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be
3636 6specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 58 per cent.
3737 7 SECTION 2. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking
3838 8the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the
3939 9following:- 2 of 3
4040 10 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget
4141 11which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be
4242 12specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 57 per cent.
4343 13 SECTION 3. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking
4444 14the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the
4545 15following:-
4646 16 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget
4747 17which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be
4848 18specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 56 per cent.
4949 19 SECTION 4. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking
5050 20the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the
5151 21following:-
5252 22 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget
5353 23which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be
5454 24specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 55 per cent.
5555 25 SECTION 5. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking
5656 26the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the
5757 27following:-
5858 28 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget
5959 29which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be
6060 30specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 54 per cent. 3 of 3
6161 31 SECTION 6. Section 2 shall take effect on January 1, 2026.
6262 32 SECTION 7. Section 3 shall take effect on January 1, 2027.
6363 33 SECTION 8. Section 4 shall take effect on January 1, 2028.
6464 34 SECTION 9. Section 5 shall take effect on January 1, 2029.