1 of 1 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1237 FILED ON: 1/15/2025 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 394 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts _________________ PRESENTED BY: Jason M. Lewis _________________ To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in General Court assembled: The undersigned legislators and/or citizens respectfully petition for the adoption of the accompanying bill: An Act increasing the Commonwealth's share of the education foundation budget. _______________ PETITION OF: NAME:DISTRICT/ADDRESS :Jason M. LewisFifth MiddlesexJoanne M. ComerfordHampshire, Franklin and Worcester2/4/2025Leigh Davis3rd Berkshire2/27/2025 1 of 3 SENATE DOCKET, NO. 1237 FILED ON: 1/15/2025 SENATE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 394 By Mr. Lewis, a petition (accompanied by bill, Senate, No. 394) of Jason M. Lewis, Joanne M. Comerford and Leigh Davis for legislation to increase the Commonwealth's share of the education foundation budget. Education. [SIMILAR MATTER FILED IN PREVIOUS SESSION SEE SENATE, NO. 303 OF 2023-2024.] The Commonwealth of Massachusetts _______________ In the One Hundred and Ninety-Fourth General Court (2025-2026) _______________ An Act increasing the Commonwealth's share of the education foundation budget. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority of the same, as follows: 1 SECTION 1. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 2the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 3following:- 4 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 5which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 6specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 58 per cent. 7 SECTION 2. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 8the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 9following:- 2 of 3 10 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 11which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 12specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 57 per cent. 13 SECTION 3. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 14the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 15following:- 16 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 17which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 18specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 56 per cent. 19 SECTION 4. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 20the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 21following:- 22 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 23which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 24specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 55 per cent. 25 SECTION 5. Section 2 of Chapter 70 of the General Laws is hereby amended by striking 26the definition of "total state target local contribution” and inserting, in place thereof the 27following:- 28 “Total state target local contribution”, the per cent of the total state foundation budget 29which is to be funded through required local contributions, provided that the per cent shall be 30specified annually in the general appropriations act but shall not exceed 54 per cent. 3 of 3 31 SECTION 6. Section 2 shall take effect on January 1, 2026. 32 SECTION 7. Section 3 shall take effect on January 1, 2027. 33 SECTION 8. Section 4 shall take effect on January 1, 2028. 34 SECTION 9. Section 5 shall take effect on January 1, 2029.