House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (41-1) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (96-37) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {883125/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |