House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-4) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {103127/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (127-3) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {563727/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |