House | 04/09/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (33-14) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (96-40) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |