Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 28 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 28 | |
5 | - | (House Bill 1080) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *hb1080* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Children and Pregnant Women | |
10 | - | (Healthy Babies Equity Act) | |
10 | + | HOUSE BILL 1080 | |
11 | + | J1 2lr1787 | |
12 | + | CF SB 778 | |
13 | + | By: Delegate Pena–Melnyk | |
14 | + | Introduced and read first time: February 10, 2022 | |
15 | + | Assigned to: Health and Government Operations | |
16 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
17 | + | House action: Adopted | |
18 | + | Read second time: March 7, 2022 | |
11 | 19 | ||
12 | - | FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide | |
13 | - | comprehensive medical care and other health care services to certain noncitizen | |
14 | - | pregnant women and their children up to a certain age; and generally relating to the | |
15 | - | Maryland Medical Assistance Program. | |
20 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
16 | 21 | ||
17 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, | |
18 | - | Article – Health – General | |
19 | - | Section 15–103(a)(1) | |
20 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
21 | - | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
22 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
22 | 23 | ||
23 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, | |
24 | - | Article – Health – General | |
25 | - | Section 15–103(a)(2)(xvi) and (xvii) | |
26 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
27 | - | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
24 | + | Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Children and Pregnant Women 2 | |
25 | + | (Healthy Babies Equity Act) 3 | |
28 | 26 | ||
29 | - | BY adding to | |
30 | - | Article – Health – General | |
31 | - | Section 15–103(a)(2)(xviii) | |
32 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
33 | - | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
27 | + | FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide 4 | |
28 | + | comprehensive medical care and other health care services to certain noncitizen 5 | |
29 | + | pregnant women and their children up to a certain age; and generally relating to the 6 | |
30 | + | Maryland Medical Assistance Program. 7 | |
34 | 31 | ||
35 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
36 | - | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: | |
32 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 8 | |
33 | + | Article – Health – General 9 | |
34 | + | Section 15–103(a)(1) 10 | |
35 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 11 | |
36 | + | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 12 | |
37 | 37 | ||
38 | - | Article – Health – General | |
38 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 13 | |
39 | + | Article – Health – General 14 | |
40 | + | Section 15–103(a)(2)(xvi) and (xvii) 15 | |
41 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 16 | |
42 | + | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 17 | |
39 | 43 | ||
40 | - | 15–103. | |
44 | + | BY adding to 18 | |
45 | + | Article – Health – General 19 | |
46 | + | Section 15–103(a)(2)(xviii) 20 | |
47 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 21 | |
48 | + | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 22 2 HOUSE BILL 1080 | |
41 | 49 | ||
42 | - | (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance | |
43 | - | Program. | |
44 | 50 | ||
45 | - | (2) The Program: | |
46 | 51 | ||
47 | - | (xvi) Beginning on January 1, 2021, shall provide, subject to the | |
48 | - | limitations of the State budget and § 15–855(b)(2) of the Insurance Article, and as permitted | |
49 | - | by federal law, services for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated Ch. 28 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
52 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 | |
53 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 | |
50 | 54 | ||
51 | - | – 2 – | |
52 | - | with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome, | |
53 | - | including the use of intravenous immunoglobulin therapy, for eligible Program recipients, | |
54 | - | if pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections | |
55 | - | and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome are coded for billing and diagnosis | |
56 | - | purposes in accordance with § 15–855(d) of the Insurance Article; [and] | |
55 | + | Article – Health – General 3 | |
57 | 56 | ||
58 | - | (xvii) Beginning on January 1, 2022, may not include, subject to federal | |
59 | - | approval and limitations of the State budget, a frequency limitation on covered dental | |
60 | - | prophylaxis care or oral health exams that requires the dental prophylaxis care or oral | |
61 | - | health exams to be provided at an interval greater than 120 days within a plan year; AND | |
57 | + | 15–103. 4 | |
62 | 58 | ||
63 | - | (XVIII) SHALL PROVIDE, SUBJECT TO THE LIMIT ATIONS OF | |
64 | - | THE STATE BUDGET , COMPREHENSIVE MEDICA L CARE AND OTHER HEA LTH CARE | |
65 | - | SERVICES TO NONCITIZEN PREGNANT WOMEN WHO WOULD BE ELIGIBLE FO R THE | |
66 | - | PROGRAM BUT FOR THEIR IMMIGRATION STATUS AND TO THEIR CHILDRE N UP TO | |
67 | - | THE AGE OF 1 YEAR. | |
59 | + | (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance 5 | |
60 | + | Program. 6 | |
68 | 61 | ||
69 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That , in implementing the | |
70 | - | requirements of Section 1 of this Act, the Maryland Department of Health shall apply for | |
71 | - | the waiver from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services that maximizes federal | |
72 | - | funding and the individuals who would be eligible for the Maryland Medical Assistance | |
73 | - | Program benefit required under Section 1 of this Act. | |
62 | + | (2) The Program: 7 | |
74 | 63 | ||
75 | - | SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July | |
76 | - | 1, 2022. | |
64 | + | (xvi) Beginning on January 1, 2021, shall provide, subject to the 8 | |
65 | + | limitations of the State budget and § 15–855(b)(2) of the Insurance Article, and as permitted 9 | |
66 | + | by federal law, services for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated 10 | |
67 | + | with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome, 11 | |
68 | + | including the use of intravenous immunoglobulin therapy, for eligible Program recipients, 12 | |
69 | + | if pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections 13 | |
70 | + | and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome are coded for billing and diagnosis 14 | |
71 | + | purposes in accordance with § 15–855(d) of the Insurance Article; [and] 15 | |
77 | 72 | ||
78 | - | Enacted under Article II, § 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution, April 9, 2022. | |
73 | + | (xvii) Beginning on January 1, 2022, may not include, subject to federal 16 | |
74 | + | approval and limitations of the State budget, a frequency limitation on covered dental 17 | |
75 | + | prophylaxis care or oral health exams that requires the dental prophylaxis care or oral 18 | |
76 | + | health exams to be provided at an interval greater than 120 days within a plan year; AND 19 | |
77 | + | ||
78 | + | (XVIII) SHALL PROVIDE, SUBJECT TO THE LIMIT ATIONS OF 20 | |
79 | + | THE STATE BUDGET , COMPREHENSIVE MEDICA L CARE AND OTHER HEA LTH CARE 21 | |
80 | + | SERVICES TO NONCITIZEN PREGNANT WOMEN WHO WOULD BE ELIGIBLE FO R THE 22 | |
81 | + | PROGRAM BUT FOR THEIR IMMIGRATION STATUS AND TO THEIR CHILDRE N UP TO 23 | |
82 | + | THE AGE OF 1 YEAR. 24 | |
83 | + | ||
84 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That , in implementing the 25 | |
85 | + | requirements of Section 1 of this Act, the Maryland Department of Health shall apply for 26 | |
86 | + | the waiver from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services that maximizes federal 27 | |
87 | + | funding and the individuals who would be eligible for the Maryland Medical Assistance 28 | |
88 | + | Program benefit required under Section 1 of this Act. 29 | |
89 | + | ||
90 | + | SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 30 | |
91 | + | 1, 2022. 31 |