Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1080 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/15/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb1080*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1080 
J1   	2lr1787 
    	CF SB 778 
By: Delegate Pena–Melnyk 
Introduced and read first time: February 10, 2022 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 7, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Children and Pregnant Women 2 
(Healthy Babies Equity Act) 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide 4 
comprehensive medical care and other health care services to certain noncitizen 5 
pregnant women and their children up to a certain age; and generally relating to the 6 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program. 7 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 8 
 Article – Health – General 9 
Section 15–103(a)(1) 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 12 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 13 
 Article – Health – General 14 
Section 15–103(a)(2)(xvi) and (xvii) 15 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 16 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 17 
 
BY adding to 18 
 Article – Health – General 19 
Section 15–103(a)(2)(xviii) 20 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 21 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 22  2 	HOUSE BILL 1080  
 
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 
 
Article – Health – General 3 
 
15–103. 4 
 
 (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance 5 
Program. 6 
 
 (2) The Program: 7 
 
 (xvi) Beginning on January 1, 2021, shall provide, subject to the 8 
limitations of the State budget and § 15–855(b)(2) of the Insurance Article, and as permitted 9 
by federal law, services for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated 10 
with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome, 11 
including the use of intravenous immunoglobulin therapy, for eligible Program recipients, 12 
if pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections 13 
and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome are coded for billing and diagnosis 14 
purposes in accordance with § 15–855(d) of the Insurance Article; [and] 15 
 
 (xvii) Beginning on January 1, 2022, may not include, subject to federal 16 
approval and limitations of the State budget, a frequency limitation on covered dental 17 
prophylaxis care or oral health exams that requires the dental prophylaxis care or oral 18 
health exams to be provided at an interval greater than 120 days within a plan year; AND 19 
 
 (XVIII) SHALL PROVIDE, SUBJECT TO THE LIMIT ATIONS OF 20 
THE STATE BUDGET , COMPREHENSIVE MEDICA L CARE AND OTHER HEA LTH CARE 21 
SERVICES TO NONCITIZEN PREGNANT WOMEN WHO WOULD BE ELIGIBLE FO R THE 22 
PROGRAM BUT FOR THEIR IMMIGRATION STATUS AND TO THEIR CHILDRE N UP TO 23 
THE AGE OF 1 YEAR. 24 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That , in implementing the 25 
requirements of Section 1 of this Act, the Maryland Department of Health shall apply for 26 
the waiver from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services that maximizes federal 27 
funding and the individuals who would be eligible for the Maryland Medical Assistance 28 
Program benefit required under Section 1 of this Act. 29 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 30 
1, 2022. 31