Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {233023/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |