Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1121 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/21/2022

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb1121*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1121 
R4   	2lr2521 
      
By: Delegates R. Jones, Brooks, Foley, Hill, Patterson, and Proctor 
Introduced and read first time: February 11, 2022 
Assigned to: Environment and Transportation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 15, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Driver’s Licenses, Identification Cards, and Registration Plates – Notation for 2 
Autism Spectrum  3 
Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability  4 
Self–Disclosure Envelope 5 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to ensure that the driver’s 6 
license, identification card, or registration plate of an applicant who indicates on an 7 
application for a driver’s license, an identification card, or a vehicle registration that 8 
the applicant is on the autism spectrum includes a notation specifying that the 9 
applicant is on the autism spectrum; requiring an application for a driver’s license, 10 
an identification card, or a vehicle registration to allow an applicant to indicate that 11 
the applicant is on the autism spectrum; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration 12 
to create a voluntary developmental disability self–disclosure envelope; and 13 
generally relating to driver’s licenses, identification cards, and registration plates of 14 
individuals on the autism spectrum developmental disability self–disclosure 15 
envelopes. 16 
 
BY renumbering 17 
 Article – Transportation 18 
Section 13–410(d), (e), (g), and (h), respectively 19 
to be Section 13–410(e), (f), (h), and (i), respectively 20 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 21 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 22 
 
BY adding to 23  2 	HOUSE BILL 1121  
 
 
 Article – Transportation 1 
Section 12–306 and 13–410(d) 2 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 3 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 4 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 5 
 Article – Transportation 6 
Section 13–403(a) and 13–410(b) 7 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 8 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 9 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 10 
 Article – Transportation 11 
Section 13–403(b) and 13–410(f) 16–118.1 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 14 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 
That Section(s) 13–410(d), (e), (g), and (h), respectively, of Article – Transportation of the 16 
Annotated Code of Maryland be renumbered to be Section(s) 13–410(e), (f), (h), and (i), 17 
respectively. 18 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 19 
as follows: 20 
 
Article – Transportation 21 
 
12–306. 22 
 
 (A) THE APPLICATION FOR A DRIVER’S LICENSE, AN IDENTIFICATION CA RD, 23 
OR A MOPED OPERATOR ’S PERMIT SHALL ALLOW AN APPLICANT TO INDI CATE THAT 24 
THE APPLICANT IS ON THE AUTISM SPECTRUM .  25 
 
 (B) THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL ENSURE THAT THE DRIV ER’S LICENSE, 26 
IDENTIFICATION CARD , OR MOPED OPERATOR ’S PERMIT OF AN APPLI CANT WHO HAS 27 
INDICATED THAT THE A PPLICANT IS ON THE A UTISM SPECTRUM ON TH E 28 
APPLICATION FOR THE DRIVER ’S LICENSE, IDENTIFICATION CARD , OR MOPED 29 
OPERATOR’S PERMIT INCLUDES A NOTATION SPECIFYING THAT THE APPLICANT I S 30 
ON THE AUTISM SPECTR UM. 31 
 
13–403. 32 
 
 (a) (1) Except as provided in paragraph (2) of this subsection, the owner of a 33 
vehicle subject to registration under this subtitle shall apply to the Administration for the 34 
registration of the vehicle in a manner that the Administration requires. 35 
   	HOUSE BILL 1121 	3 
 
 
 (2) The application for registration of a low speed vehicle shall be made by 1 
electronic transmission under § 13–610 of this title. 2 
 
 (b) The application shall [contain]:  3 
 
 (1) CONTAIN the information that the Administration reasonably requires 4 
to determine if the vehicle is entitled to registration; AND 5 
 
 (2) ALLOW AN APPLICANT TO INDICATE THAT THE APPLICANT I S ON 6 
THE AUTISM SPECTRUM . 7 
 
13–410. 8 
 
 (b) (1) Each registration plate shall display: 9 
 
 (i) The registration number assigned to the vehicle for which it is 10 
issued; and 11 
 
 (ii) The name of this State, which may be abbreviated. 12 
 
 (2) The registration number may consist of letters, numerals, or both. 13 
 
 (D) THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL ENSURE THAT THE REGI STRATION PLATE 14 
OF AN APPLICANT REGI STERING A VEHICLE UN DER THIS TITLE INCLU DES A 15 
NOTATION SPECIFYING THAT THE APPLICANT I S ON THE AUTISM SPECTRUM IF THE 16 
APPLICANT INDICATES ON THE APPLICATION F OR THE REGISTRATION PLATE THAT 17 
THE APPLICANT IS ON THE AUTISM SPECTRUM . 18 
 
 [(f)] (G) Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection [(d)] (E) of this section, 19 
the Administration may issue reflectorized registration plates under §§ 13–618 and 13–619 20 
of this title. 21 
 
16–118.1. 22 
 
 (a) (1) The Administration shall develop [a form for] a voluntary 23 
developmental disability self–disclosure card AND A VOLUNTARY DEVE LOPMENTAL 24 
DISABILITY SELF–DISCLOSURE ENVELOPE . 25 
 
 (2) [A] THE voluntary developmental disability self–disclosure card AND 26 
THE VOLUNTARY DEVELO PMENTAL DISABILITY S ELF–DISCLOSURE ENVELOPE shall 27 
EACH: 28 
 
 (i) Be approximately the same size as a driver’s license; 29 
 
 (ii) Be printed on blue paper OR BLUE STUR DY MATERIAL; 30  4 	HOUSE BILL 1121  
 
 
 
 (iii) Include space for an individual to provide details on a 1 
developmental disability; and 2 
 
 (iv) Include written guidance on effective communication between 3 
law enforcement officers and people with developmental disabilities. 4 
 
 (3) In developing the [form] DEVELOPMENTAL DISABI LITY  5 
SELF–DISCLOSURE CARD AND 	THE DEVELOPMENTAL DI SABILITY SELF –6 
DISCLOSURE ENVELOPE required by this subsection, the Administration shall consult 7 
with the Maryland Chiefs of Police Association and at least one independent organization 8 
that advocates on behalf of individuals with developmental disabilities. 9 
 
 (b) (1) (I) Beginning January 1, 2021, the Administration shall make a 10 
voluntary developmental disability self–disclosure card available to any individual of 11 
driving age who requests one. 12 
 
 [(2)] (II) If an individual who requests a voluntary developmental 13 
disability self–disclosure card is a minor, the Administration shall provide the card to the 14 
individual’s parent or guardian. 15 
 
 (2) (I) BEGINNING JANUARY 1, 2023, THE ADMINISTRATION 16 
SHALL MAKE A VOLUNTA RY DEVELOPMENTAL DIS ABILITY SELF–DISCLOSURE 17 
ENVELOPE AVAILABLE T O ANY INDIVIDUAL OF DRIVING AGE WHO R EQUESTS ONE. 18 
 
 (II) IF AN INDIVIDUAL WHO REQUESTS A VOLUNTARY  19 
SELF–DISCLOSURE ENVELOPE IS A MINOR, THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL PROVIDE 20 
THE ENVELOPE TO THE INDIVIDUAL’S PARENT OR GUARDIAN . 21 
 
 (c) [Except as required by § 16–118 of this subtitle, the Administration may not 22 
maintain any records relating to the issuance of a voluntary developmental disability  23 
self–disclosure card] THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL DEVELOP INFORMATIONA L 24 
MATERIALS ABOUT THE AVAILABILITY OF THE VOLUNTARY DEVELOPMEN TAL 25 
DISABILITY SELF –DISCLOSURE CARD AND THE VOLUNTARY DEVELO PMENTAL  26 
SELF–DISCLOSURE ENVELOPE THAT ARE: 27 
 
 (1) WRITTEN IN PLAIN LANG UAGE; 28 
 
 (2) PUBLISHED ON THE ADMINISTRATION ’S WEBSITE; 29 
 
 (3) POSTED AT ALL MOTOR VEHICLE ADMINISTRATION LOCATI ONS; 30 
 
 (4) INCLUDED IN THE DRIVE R’S EDUCATION CURRICUL UM; AND 31 
   	HOUSE BILL 1121 	5 
 
 
 (5) MADE AVAILABLE TO ALL INDIVIDUALS DURING T HE PROCESS OF 1 
APPLYING FOR OR RENE WING A DRIVER’S LICENSE. 2 
 
 (D) IN DEVELOPING THE INF ORMATIONAL MATERIALS REQUIRED BY 3 
SUBSECTION (C) OF THIS SECTION, THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL CONSULT WITH AT 4 
LEAST ONE ORGANIZATI ON THAT ADVOCATES ON BEHALF OF INDIVIDUAL S WITH 5 
DEVELOPMENTAL DISABI LITIES.  6 
 
 SECTION 3. 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 7 
October 1, 2022.  8 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.