House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (33-13) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (99-26) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {453524/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations | ||
House | 09/29/2021 | Pre-filed |