Senate | 04/09/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (103-28) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Floor Amendment {533828/1 (Delegate D. Jones) Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Rereferred to Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |