Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {123420/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/17/2022 | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 09/28/2021 | Pre-filed |