House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {973623/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 10/05/2021 | Pre-filed |