Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 406 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 406 | |
5 | - | (House Bill 178) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *hb0178* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues | |
10 | + | HOUSE BILL 178 | |
11 | + | J1 2lr0634 | |
12 | + | HB 889/21 – HGO (PRE–FILED) | |
13 | + | By: Delegates Chang and Krimm, Krimm, Pendergrass, Pena–Melnyk, Bagnall, | |
14 | + | Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, | |
15 | + | Kerr, Kipke, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, | |
16 | + | and K. Young | |
17 | + | Requested: October 5, 2021 | |
18 | + | Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 | |
19 | + | Assigned to: Health and Government Operations | |
20 | + | Committee Report: Favorable with amendments | |
21 | + | House action: Adopted | |
22 | + | Read second time: March 10, 2022 | |
10 | 23 | ||
11 | - | FOR the purpose of altering the definition of “cottage food business” for the purpose of | |
12 | - | increasing the cap on the annual revenue from the sale of cottage food products that | |
13 | - | a cottage food business may earn; and generally relating to cottage food businesses | |
14 | - | and annual revenues. | |
24 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
15 | 25 | ||
16 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, | |
17 | - | Article – Health – General | |
18 | - | Section 21–301(a) | |
19 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
20 | - | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
26 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
21 | 27 | ||
22 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, | |
23 | - | Article – Health – General | |
24 | - | Section 21–301(b–1) | |
25 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
26 | - | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
28 | + | Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues 2 | |
27 | 29 | ||
28 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
29 | - | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: | |
30 | + | FOR the purpose of altering the definition of “cottage food business” for the purpose of 3 | |
31 | + | increasing the cap on the annual revenue from the sale of cottage food products that 4 | |
32 | + | a cottage food business may earn; and generally relating to cottage food businesses 5 | |
33 | + | and annual revenues. 6 | |
30 | 34 | ||
31 | - | Article – Health – General | |
35 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 7 | |
36 | + | Article – Health – General 8 | |
37 | + | Section 21–301(a) 9 | |
38 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 10 | |
39 | + | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11 | |
32 | 40 | ||
33 | - | 21–301. | |
41 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12 | |
42 | + | Article – Health – General 13 | |
43 | + | Section 21–301(b–1) 14 | |
44 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 15 | |
45 | + | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16 | |
34 | 46 | ||
35 | - | (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. | |
47 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 | |
48 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 2 HOUSE BILL 178 | |
36 | 49 | ||
37 | - | (b–1) “Cottage food business” means a business that: | |
38 | 50 | ||
39 | - | (1) Produces or packages cottage food products in a residential kitchen; | |
40 | 51 | ||
41 | - | (2) Sells the cottage food products in accordance with § 21–330.1 of this | |
42 | - | subtitle and regulations adopted by the Department; and | |
52 | + | Article – Health – General 1 | |
43 | 53 | ||
44 | - | (3) Has annual revenues from the sale of cottage food products in an | |
45 | - | amount not exceeding [$25,000] $100,000 $50,000. | |
54 | + | 21–301. 2 | |
46 | 55 | ||
47 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect | |
48 | - | October 1, 2022. | |
49 | - | Ch. 406 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
56 | + | (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 3 | |
50 | 57 | ||
51 | - | – 2 – | |
52 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2022. | |
58 | + | (b–1) “Cottage food business” means a business that: 4 | |
59 | + | ||
60 | + | (1) Produces or packages cottage food products in a residential kitchen; 5 | |
61 | + | ||
62 | + | (2) Sells the cottage food products in accordance with § 21–330.1 of this 6 | |
63 | + | subtitle and regulations adopted by the Department; and 7 | |
64 | + | ||
65 | + | (3) Has annual revenues from the sale of cottage food products in an 8 | |
66 | + | amount not exceeding [$25,000] $100,000 $50,000. 9 | |
67 | + | ||
68 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 10 | |
69 | + | October 1, 2022. 11 | |
70 | + | ||
71 | + | ||
72 | + | ||
73 | + | ||
74 | + | ||
75 | + | Approved: | |
76 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
77 | + | Governor. | |
78 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
79 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. | |
80 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
81 | + | President of the Senate. |