Senate | 04/05/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (97-33) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {793524/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 11/01/2021 | Pre-filed |