House | 05/27/2022 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (116-14) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {783326/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |