House | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59 | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (33-13) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (97-40) | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Floor Amendment {703523/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (42-92) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {533820/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |