Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB413 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 04/22/2022

                             LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor 	Ch. 59 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 59 
(House Bill 413) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization – Extension of Provider Fee 
 
FOR the purpose of continuing the stabilization of the individual health insurance market 
by extending to a certain calendar year the assessment of a health insurance 
provider fee; exempting stand–alone vision and dental plan carriers that are subject 
to the health insurance provider fee assessment from the health care regulatory 
assessment fee and annual assessment fee in certain years; providing that funds 
from the distribution of the health insurance provider fee assessment can only be 
used for certain purposes; and generally relating to the individual health insurance 
market. 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
Article – Insurance 
Section 6–102.1 and 31–107(g)(4) 
Annotated Code of Maryland 
(2017 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 
 
BY adding to 
 Article – Insurance 
 Section 6–105.3 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2017 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement)  
 
SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Insurance 
 
6–102.1. 
 
 (a) This section applies to: 
 
 (1) an insurer, a nonprofit health service plan, a health maintenance 
organization, a dental plan organization, a fraternal benefit organization, and any other 
person subject to regulation by the State that provides a product that: 
 
 (i) was subject to § 9010 of the Affordable Care Act, as in effect on 
December 1, 2019; and 
 
 (ii) may be subject to an assessment by the State; and 
  Ch. 59 	2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 (2) a managed care organization authorized under Title 15, Subtitle 1 of 
the Health – General Article. 
 
 (b) The purpose of this section is to assist in the stabilization of the individual 
health insurance market by assessing a health insurance provider fee that is attributable 
to State health risk for calendar years 2019 through [2023] 2028, both inclusive, as 
provided for under subsection (c) of this section. 
 
 (c) (1) In calendar year 2019, in addition to the amounts otherwise due under 
this subtitle, an entity subject to this section shall be subject to an assessment of 2.75% on 
all amounts used to calculate the entity’s premium tax liability under § 6–102 of this 
subtitle or the amount of the entity’s premium tax exemption value for calendar year 2018. 
 
 (2) In calendar years 2020 through [2023] 2028, both inclusive, in addition 
to the amounts otherwise due under this subtitle, an entity subject to this section shall be 
subject to an assessment of 1% on all amounts used to calculate the entity’s premium tax 
liability under § 6–102 of this subtitle or the amount of the entity’s premium tax exemption 
value for the immediately preceding calendar year. 
 
 (3) The assessments required in paragraphs (1) and (2) of this subsection 
are for products that: 
 
 (i) were subject to § 9010 of the Affordable Care Act, as in effect on 
December 1, 2019; and 
 
 (ii) may be subject to an assessment by the State. 
 
 (4) The calculation of the assessments required under paragraphs (1) and 
(2) of this subsection shall be made without regard to: 
 
 (i) the threshold limits established in § 9010(b)(2)(A) of the 
Affordable Care Act; or 
 
 (ii) the partial exclusion of net premiums provided for in § 
9010(b)(2)(B) of the Affordable Care Act. 
 
 (d) (1) (i) In each of fiscal years 2021 and 2022, $100,000,000 of the funds 
collected from the assessment required under this section shall be transferred in accordance 
with subparagraphs (ii) and (iii) of this paragraph to Medical Care Provider 
Reimbursements (M00Q01.03) within the Medical Care Programs Administration of the 
Maryland Department of Health. 
 
 (ii) If all or a portion of the funds required to be transferred under 
subparagraph (i) of this paragraph have been received and are held in the Maryland Health 
Benefit Exchange Fund established under § 31–107 of this article, the Governor shall 
transfer the available amount in the Fund.   LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor 	Ch. 59 
 
– 3 – 
 
 (iii) If the amount of funds transferred under subparagraph (ii) of this 
paragraph is less than the amount required to be transferred under subparagraph (i) of 
this paragraph, the Insurance Commissioner shall transfer the remaining amount from the 
funds collected from the assessment required under this section. 
 
 (2) At the beginning of each of fiscal years 2023 and 2024, the Governor 
shall transfer the first $8,000,000 of the funds collected from the assessment required 
under this section to the Community Health Resources Commission. 
 
 (3) Notwithstanding § 2–114 of this article, the remainder of the 
assessment required under this section after any transfers made under paragraphs (1) and 
(2) of this subsection shall be distributed by the Commissioner to the Maryland Health 
Benefit Exchange Fund established under § 31–107 of this article. 
 
6–105.3. 
 
 A STAND–ALONE DENTAL PLAN CA RRIER OR A STAND –ALONE VISION PLAN 
CARRIER THAT IS SUBJ ECT TO THE HEALTH IN SURANCE PROVIDER FEE 
ASSESSMENT IMPOSED U NDER § 6–102.1 OF THIS SUBTITLE IN CALENDAR YEAR 
2024 AND EACH CALENDAR YE AR THEREAFTER IS EXE MPT FROM THE HEALTH CARE 
REGULATORY ASSESSMEN T UNDER § 2–112.2 OF THIS ARTICLE AND THE ANNUAL 
ASSESSMENT FEE UNDER § 2–502 OF THIS ARTICLE FO R EACH YEAR IN WHICH THE 
HEALTH INSURANCE PRO VIDER FEE IS PAID. 
 
31–107. 
 
 (g) (4) The following funds may be used only for the purposes of funding the 
State Reinsurance Program: 
 
 (i) any pass–through funds received from the federal government 
under a waiver approved under § 1332 of the Affordable Care Act to provide reinsurance to 
carriers that offer individual health benefit plans in the State; 
 
 (ii) any funds designated by the federal government to provide 
reinsurance to carriers that offer individual health benefit plans in the State; [and] 
 
 (iii) any funds designated by the State to provide reinsurance to 
carriers that offer individual health benefit plans in the State; AND 
 
 (IV) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED I N SUBSECTION (F) OF THIS SECTION, 
FUNDS RECEIVED FROM THE DI STRIBUTION OF THE AS SESSMENT UNDER § 6–102.1 
OF THIS ARTICLE . 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That:  Ch. 59 	2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 
 (a) On or before December 1, 2023, the Maryland Insurance Administration, in 
consultation with the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and the Maryland Health Care 
Commission, shall report to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 
Government Article, the General Assembly, on the impact of the State Reinsurance 
Program. 
 
 (b) In developing the report, the Maryland Insurance Administration shall:  
 
 (1) consider whether the level of funding is appropriate, taking into 
account future population growth and projected premium growth; 
 
 (2) consider whether the assessment established under § 6–102.1 of the 
Insurance Article: 
 
 (i) is appropriately apportioned among the carriers; 
 
 (ii) should be broadened to include other business sectors; and 
 
 (iii) should be supplemented with General Funds;  
 
 (3) consider what market reforms are needed to provide affordable health 
coverage in the individual market, including: 
 
 (i) continuation of the Program past 2026; 
 
 (ii) providing State–based premium subsidies; and 
 
 (iii) expanding eligibility for the Maryland Medical Assistance 
Program; and 
 
 (4) evaluate the design of the Program, including whether the program 
parameters established under § 31–117 of the Insurance Article are appropriate in light of 
other individual market reforms at the State and federal level, including: 
 
 (i) the Young Adult Subsidies Program; 
 
 (ii) the Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program;  
 
 (iii) a special or other enrollment period opened under § 31–108 of the 
Insurance Article; and 
 
 (iv) premium subsidies available under the American Rescue Plan 
Act or any other federal law. 
   LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor 	Ch. 59 
 
– 5 – 
 (c) The report shall include options for obtaining sustainable funding sources to 
support stability in the individual market.  
 
SECTION 2. 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 
October 1, 2022. 
 
Approved by the Governor, April 12, 2022.