Senate | 04/07/2022 | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Zucker) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {293325/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {293926/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |