House | 05/27/2022 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (92-41) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (31-16) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {993222/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (93-36) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {193522/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Economic Matters |