House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (96-37) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Appropriations | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 09/10/2021 | Pre-filed |