House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (107-28) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Morgan) Adopted | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {803827/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/30/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |