Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB542 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/07/2022

                             LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 641 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 641 
(House Bill 542) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
State Retirement and Pension System – Investment Committee – Use of 
Minority and Women–Owned Business Enterprises 
(Diversity Among Asset Managers Act of 2022) 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Investment Committee of the State Retirement Agency 
to use minority business enterprises to provide a certain percentage of brokerage and 
investment management services to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement 
and Pension System and to manage a certain percentage of system assets; requiring 
the Investment Committee of the State Retirement Agency to assess the use of 
minority business enterprises beginning on a certain date; requiring a certain 
certification agency and the Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women 
Business Affairs, in consultation with certain entities, to study the brokerage and 
investment services used by the State Retirement and Pension System to evaluate 
whether remedial measures to assist minority and women–owned businesses would 
comply with a certain court opinion and any subsequent federal or constitutional 
requirements; and generally relating to the use of minority and women–owned 
business enterprises in the State Retirement and Pension System. 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 
 Article – State Personnel and Pensions 
Section 21–116(a) 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Article – State Personnel and Pensions 
Section 21–116(d) 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – State Personnel and Pensions 
 
21–116. 
 
 (a) By resolution, the Board of Trustees shall specify the powers of the Investment 
Committee. 
  Ch. 641 	2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 (d) (1) (i) Consistent with minority business purchasing standards 
applicable to units of State government under the State Finance and Procurement Article 
and consistent with the fiduciary duties of the Board of Trustees, the Board of Trustees 
shall direct the Investment Committee to [attempt to] use [to the greatest extent feasible] 
minority business enterprises to provide brokerage and investment management services 
to the Board IN ACCORDANCE WITH S UBPARAGRAPH (II) OF THIS PARAGRAPH . 
 
 (ii) THE USE OF MINORITY B USINESS ENTERPRISES UNDER 
SUBPARAGRAPH (I) OF THIS PARAGRAPH SH ALL CONSIST OF: 
 
 1. AT LEAST 20% OF BROKERAGE AND INV ESTMENT 
MANAGEMENT SERVICES TO THE BOARD; AND  
 
 2. MANAGEMENT OF AT LEA ST 20% OF THE ASSETS OF 
THE SEVERAL SYSTEMS . 
 
 (III) (II) FOR THE FISCAL YEAR B EGINNING JULY 1, 2022, AND 
EACH FISCAL YEAR THE REAFTER, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES SHALL ASSESS THE USE 
OF MINORITY BUSINESS ENTERPRISES AS REQUI RED UNDER THIS SUBSE CTION. 
 
 (IV) (III) For purposes of this subsection, brokerage and investment 
management services shall include services relating to all allocated asset classes. 
 
 (2) (i) To assist it in achieving the [goal] GOALS described under 
paragraph (1) of this subsection, the Investment Committee shall undertake measures to 
remove any barriers that limit full participation by minority business enterprises in 
brokerage and investment management services opportunities afforded under this title. 
 
 (ii) The measures undertaken by the Investment Committee shall 
include the use of a wide variety of media, including the State Retirement Agency’s website, 
to provide notice to a broad and varied range of potential providers about the brokerage 
and investment management services opportunities afforded by the State Retirement 
Agency. 
 
 (3) In consultation with the Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and 
Women Business Affairs and the Investment Committee, the Board of Trustees shall 
develop guidelines to assist the Investment Committee in identifying and evaluating 
qualified minority business enterprises in order to help the State Retirement Agency 
achieve the objective for greater use of minority business enterprises for brokerage and 
investment management services. 
 
 (4) On or before September 1 each year, the Investment Committee shall 
submit a report to the Board of Trustees, the Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and 
Women Business Affairs and, subject to § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the 
General Assembly on:   LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 641 
 
– 3 – 
 
 (i) the identity of the minority business enterprise brokerage and 
investment management services firms used by the Investment Committee in the 
immediately preceding fiscal year; 
 
 (ii) the percentage and dollar value of the assets that are under the 
control of the Investment Committee that are under the investment control of minority 
business enterprise brokerage and investment management services firms for each 
allocated asset class; and 
 
 (iii) the measures the Investment Committee undertook in the 
immediately preceding fiscal year in accordance with paragraph (2)(ii) of this subsection. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 
 
 (a) The certification agency designated by the Board of Public Works under §  
14–303(b) of the State Finance and Procurement Article and the Governor’s Office of Small, 
Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in consultation with the State Retirement and 
Pension System, the Office of the Attorney General, and the General Assembly, shall 
initiate a study regarding the brokerage and investment services used by the State 
Retirement and Pension System to evaluate whether the enactment of remedial measures 
to assist minority and women–owned businesses in the brokerage and investment 
management services industry and market would comply with the Croson decision and any 
subsequent federal or constitutional requirements.  
 
 (b) The certification agency and the Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and 
Women Business Affairs shall submit the findings of the study required under subsection 
(a) of this section to the Legislative Policy Committee, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the 
State Government Article, on or before July 1, 2023, so that the General Assembly may 
review the findings before the 2024 Session. 
 
 (c) The State Retirement and Pension System shall provide to the certification 
agency any information deemed necessary to assess the need for remedial measures to 
assist minority and women–owned businesses in the brokerage and investment 
management services industry and market. 
 
 (d) The Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in 
consultation with the certification agency and the Office of the Attorney General, shall 
develop race– and gender–neutral approaches to address the needs of minority and  
women–owned businesses in the brokerage and investment management services industry 
and market and submit its report to the Legislative Policy Committee, in accordance with 
§ 2–1257 of the State Government Article, on or before December 1, 2022, so that the 
General Assembly may review, consider, and adopt race– and gender–neutral alternatives 
to remedial measures that are not race and gender neutral.  
  Ch. 641 	2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 SECTION 2. 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 
July June 1, 2022. Section 2 of this Act shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 1 
month and, at the end of June 30, 2023, Section 2 of this Act, with no further action required 
by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect.  
 
Enacted under Article II, § 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution, May 29, 2022.