House | 05/27/2022 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-15) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Third Reading Passed (93-36) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Economic Matters |