Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB611 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/18/2022

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0611*  
  
HOUSE BILL 611 
P2   	2lr2383 
    	CF SB 259 
By: Delegates Valderrama, Rogers, Brooks, Charkoudian, Fennell, Harrison, 
Healey, Jackson, Johnson, Luedtke, Pena–Melnyk, Qi, Stein, and Turner 
Introduced and read first time: January 31, 2022 
Assigned to: Economic Matters 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 11, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability 2 
 
FOR the purpose of applying the Prevailing Wage Law to a certain contract for the 3 
construction of a public work under certain circumstances; and generally relating to 4 
the applicability of the Prevailing Wage Law. 5 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 7 
Section 17–201 and 17–202 8 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 
 (2021 Replacement Volume) 10 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 11 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 12 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 13 
 
17–201. 14 
 
 (a) In this subtitle, unless the context indicates otherwise, the following words 15 
have the meanings indicated. 16 
 
 (b) “Apprentice” means an individual who: 17 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 611  
 
 
 (1) is at least 16 years old; 1 
 
 (2) has signed with an employer or employer’s agent, an association of 2 
employers, an organization of employees, or a joint committee from both, an agreement 3 
including a statement of: 4 
 
 (i) the trade, craft, or occupation that the individual is learning; and 5 
 
 (ii) the beginning and ending dates of the apprenticeship; and 6 
 
 (3) is registered in a program of the Council or the Office of Apprenticeship 7 
of the United States Department of Labor. 8 
 
 (c) “Commissioner” means: 9 
 
 (1) the Commissioner of Labor and Industry; 10 
 
 (2) the Deputy Commissioner of Labor and Industry; or 11 
 
 (3) an authorized representative of the Commissioner. 12 
 
 (d) “Construction” includes all: 13 
 
 (1) building; 14 
 
 (2) reconstructing; 15 
 
 (3) improving; 16 
 
 (4) enlarging; 17 
 
 (5) painting and decorating; 18 
 
 (6) altering; 19 
 
 (7) maintaining; [and] 20 
 
 (8) repairing; AND 21 
 
 (9) SERVICES PROVIDED UN DER A MECHANICAL SYS TEMS SERVICE 22 
CONTRACT. 23 
 
 (e) “Council” means the Apprenticeship and Training Council. 24 
 
 (f) (1) “Employee” means an apprentice or worker employed by a contractor or 25 
subcontractor under a public work contract. 26 
   	HOUSE BILL 611 	3 
 
 
 (2) “Employee” does not include an individual employed by a public body. 1 
 
 (g) (1) “Locality” means the county in which the work is to be performed. 2 
 
 (2) If the public work is located within 2 or more counties, the locality 3 
includes all counties in which the public work is located. 4 
 
 (H) “MECHANICAL SYSTEMS SE RVICE CONTRACT ” MEANS A CONTRACT FOR : 5 
 
 (1) HVAC SYSTEMS, INCLUDING HEATING , VENTILATION, 6 
DUCTWORK , AND COOLING/AIR–CONDITIONING EQUIPME NT; 7 
 
 (2) REFRIGERATION SYSTEM S; 8 
 
 (3) PLUMBING SYSTEMS , INCLUDING PIPES , TANKS, FITTINGS, AND 9 
OTHER ELEMENTS THAT CONTROL THE WATER AN D GAS SUPPLY , HEATING, AND 10 
SANITATION OF A BUIL DING;  11 
 
 (4) ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS , INCLUDING ELECTRICAL COMPO NENTS 12 
THAT SUPPLY, DISTRIBUTE, GENERATE, AND USE ELECTRICAL P OWER, OVERHEAD 13 
AND UNDERGROUND LINE S, POLES, TRANSFORMERS , AND OTHER RELATED 14 
EQUIPMENT; AND 15 
 
 (5) ELEVATOR SYSTEMS , INCLUDING ESCALATORS , MOVING 16 
WALKWAYS, AND OTHER CONVEYANC ES. 17 
 
 [(h)] (I) “Prevailing wage rate” means the hourly rate of wages paid in the 18 
locality as determined by the Commissioner under § 17–208 of this subtitle. 19 
 
 [(i)] (J) (1) “Public body” means: 20 
 
 (i) the State; 21 
 
 (ii) except as provided in paragraph (2)(i) of this subsection, a unit of 22 
the State government or instrumentality of the State; 23 
 
 (iii) any political subdivision, agency, person, or entity with respect 24 
to the construction of any public work for which 25% or more of the money used for 25 
construction is State money; 26 
 
 (iv) notwithstanding paragraph (2)(ii) of this subsection, a political 27 
subdivision if its governing body: 28 
 
 1. provides by ordinance or resolution that the political 29 
subdivision is covered by this subtitle; and 30  4 	HOUSE BILL 611  
 
 
 
 2. gives written notice of that ordinance or resolution to the 1 
Commissioner; and 2 
 
 (v) the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. 3 
 
 (2) “Public body” does not include: 4 
 
 (i) except as provided in paragraph (1)(v) of this subsection, a unit 5 
of the State government or instrumentality of the State funded wholly from a source other 6 
than the State; or 7 
 
 (ii) any political subdivision, agency, person, or entity with respect 8 
to the construction of any public work for which less than 25% of the money used for 9 
construction is State money. 10 
 
 [(j)] (K) (1) Subject to paragraph (2) of this subsection, “public work” means 11 
a structure or work, including a bridge, building, ditch, road, alley, waterwork, or sewage 12 
disposal plant, that: 13 
 
 (i) is constructed for public use or benefit; or 14 
 
 (ii) is paid for wholly or partly by public money. 15 
 
 (2) “Public work” does not include: 16 
 
 (i) unless let to contract, a structure or work whose construction is 17 
performed by a public service company under order of the Public Service Commission or 18 
other public authority regardless of: 19 
 
 1. public supervision or direction; or 20 
 
 2. payment wholly or partly from public money; or 21 
 
 (ii) a capital project that receives State funds in the annual State 22 
capital budget as: 23 
 
 1. a local House of Delegates initiative; or 24 
 
 2. a local Senate initiative. 25 
 
 [(k)] (L) “Public work contract” means a contract for construction of a public 26 
work. 27 
 
 [(l)] (M) “Worker” means a laborer or mechanic. 28 
 
17–202. 29   	HOUSE BILL 611 	5 
 
 
 
 (a) This subtitle does not limit: 1 
 
 (1) the hours of work an employee may work in a particular period of time; 2 
or 3 
 
 (2) the right of a contractor to pay an employee under a public work 4 
contract more than the prevailing wage rate. 5 
 
 (b) [This] EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBSECTION (E) OF THIS SECTION, THIS 6 
subtitle does not apply to: 7 
 
 (1) a public work contract of less than $250,000; or 8 
 
 (2) the part of a public work contract for which the federal government 9 
provides money if, as to that part, the contractor is required to pay the prevailing wage rate 10 
as determined by the United States Secretary of Labor. 11 
 
 (c) If this subtitle and the federal Davis–Bacon Act apply and the federal act is 12 
suspended, the Governor may declare this subtitle suspended for the same period for: 13 
 
 (1) the part of that public work contract for which the United States 14 
Secretary of Labor would have been required to make a determination of a prevailing wage 15 
rate; or 16 
 
 (2) that entire public work contract. 17 
 
 (d) (1) Subject to paragraph (2) of this subsection, this subtitle applies to the 18 
construction of a structure or work, including a bridge, a building, a ditch, a road, an alley, 19 
a waterwork, or a sewage disposal plant, funded with bond proceeds from bonds issued in 20 
accordance with Title 12, Subtitle 2 of the Economic Development Article that is located in 21 
a designated tax increment financing development district created on or after July 1, 2018, 22 
established under State or local law. 23 
 
 (2) This subsection applies to the construction of a structure or work only 24 
if a political subdivision of the State, Baltimore City, or the Revenue Authority of Prince 25 
George’s County authorizes that the construction of the structure or work is subject to this 26 
subtitle. 27 
 
 (E) THIS SUBTITLE APPLIES TO A MECHANICAL SYST EMS SERVICE 28 
CONTRACT THAT IS PART OF A PUBLIC WORK CON TRACT WITH A VALUE I N EXCESS 29 
OF THE THRESHOLD SPE CIFIED IN 41 U.S.C. 6702(A)(2), THE MCNAMARA–O’HARA 30 
SERVICE CONTRACT ACT OF 1965 (SCA). 31 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 32 
October 1, 2022. 33