House
|
05/27/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Floor Amendment {653928/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {963227/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {963227/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Budget and Taxation Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (96-33)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {433320/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
|
|
|