Senate | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-7) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |