House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 603 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |