House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |