House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (93-37) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {983327/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 11/01/2021 | Pre-filed |