Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB76 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/19/2022

                             LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 415 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 415 
(House Bill 76) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems – Exemption From Energy and 
Property Taxes 
 
FOR the purpose of exempting certain community solar energy generating systems from 
local energy taxes and personal property taxes; prohibiting the supervisor of a county 
or a municipal corporation from accepting applications for the exemption after a 
certain date; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to report 
annually certain information to certain committees of the General Assembly; and 
generally relating to tax exemptions an exemption from the personal property tax 
for community solar energy generating systems. 
 
BY adding to 
 Article – Local Government 
Section 20–203 to be under the amended subtitle “Subtitle 2. Limitations on 
Authority to Tax” 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2013 Volume and 2021 Supplement) 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Article – Tax – Property 
Section 7–237 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Local Government 
 
Subtitle 2. Limitations on Authority to Tax [Advertising]. 
 
20–203. 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 
INDICATED. 
 
 (2) “BROWNFIELD” MEANS: 
 
 (I) A FORMER INDUSTRIAL OR COMMERCIAL SITE IDENTIFIED 
BY FEDERAL OR STATE LAWS OR REGULAT IONS AS CONTAMINATED OR POLLUTED ;   Ch. 415 	2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 
 (II) A CLOSED MUNICIPAL O R RUBBLE LANDFILL RE GULATED 
UNDER A REFUSE DISPO SAL PERMIT BY THE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF THE 
ENVIRONMENT ; OR  
 
 (III) MINED LANDS AS DEFIN ED IN COMAR 26.21.01.01.  
 
 (3) “COMMUNITY SOLAR ENERG Y GENERATING SYSTEM ” HAS THE 
MEANING STATED IN § 7–306.2 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 
 
 (4) “ELECTRIC COMPANY ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 1–101 OF 
THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 
 
 (B) NOTWITHSTANDING ANY O THER LAW, A TAX IMPOSED BY A P OLITICAL 
SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE ON THE SALE , USE, DELIVERY, DISTRIBUTION, 
PRODUCTION , OR CONSUMPTION OF EN ERGY DOES NOT APPLY TO ENERGY 
PRODUCED BY A COMMUN ITY SOLAR ENERGY GEN ERATING SYSTEM THAT: 
 
 (1) PROVIDES AT LEAST 50% OF THE ENERGY IT PRO DUCES TO  
LOW– OR MODERATE –INCOME CUSTOMERS , AS DEFINED IN REGULA TIONS OF THE 
PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION, AT A COST THAT IS AT LEAST 20% LESS THAN THE 
AMOUNT CHARGED BY TH E ELECTRIC COMPANY T HAT SERVES THE AREA WHERE 
THE COMMUNITY SOLAR ENERGY GENERATING SY STEM IS LOCATED ; AND 
 
 (2) IS INSTALLED ON A RO OFTOP, PARKING FACILITY CAN OPY, OR 
BROWNFIELD . 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 
as follows: 
 
Article – Tax – Property 
 
7–237. 
 
 (a) Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, personal property is 
exempt from property tax if the property is machinery or equipment used to generate: 
 
 (1) electricity or steam for sale; or 
 
 (2) hot or chilled water for sale that is used to heat or cool a building. 
 
 (b) Subject to § 7–514 of this title, AND EXCEPT AS PROVID ED IN SUBSECTION 
(C) OF THIS SECTION , personal property that is machinery or equipment described in 
subsection (a) of this section is subject to county or municipal corporation property tax on:   LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 415 
 
– 3 – 
 
 (1) 75% of its value for the taxable year beginning July 1, 2000; and 
 
 (2) 50% of its value for the taxable year beginning July 1, 2001 and each 
subsequent taxable year. 
 
 (C) (1) (I) IN THIS SUBSECTION TH E FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE 
MEANINGS INDICATED . 
 
 (II) “BROWNFIELD” MEANS: 
 
 1. A FORMER INDUSTRIAL OR COMMERCIAL SITE 
IDENTIFIED BY FEDERA L OR STATE LAWS OR REGULAT IONS AS CONTAMINATED OR 
POLLUTED; OR  
 
 2. A CLOSED MUNICIPAL O R RUBBLE LANDFILL 
REGULATED UNDER A REFUSE DISPOSAL PERMIT BY T HE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT 
OF THE ENVIRONMENT ; OR. 
 
 3. MINED LANDS AS DEFIN ED IN COMAR 26.21.01.01.  
 
 (III) “COMMUNITY SOLAR ENERG Y GENERATING SYSTEM ” HAS 
THE MEANING STATED I N § 7–306.2 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 
 
 (IV) “ELECTRIC COMPANY ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN §  
1–101 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 
 
 (2) PERSONAL PROPERTY IS EXEMPT FROM COUNTY O R MUNICIPAL 
CORPORATION PROPERTY TAX IF THE PROPERTY IS MACHINERY OR EQUI PMENT 
THAT: 
 
 (I) AS DEFINED IN REGULATION OF THE PUBLIC SERVICE 
COMMISSION, IS PART OF A COMMUNI TY SOLAR ENERGY GENE RATING SYSTEM 
THAT: 
 
 1. HAS A GENERATING CAP ACITY THAT DOES NOT 
EXCEED 2 MEGAWATTS AS MEASURE D BY THE ALTERNATING CURRENT RATING OF 
THE SYSTEM’S INVERTER; AND 
 
 2. PROVIDES AT LEAST 50% OF THE ENERGY IT 
PRODUCES TO LOW – OR MODERATE –INCOME CUSTOMERS , AS DEFINED IN 
REGULATIONS OF THE PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION, AT A COST THAT IS AT LEAST 
20% LESS THAN THE AMOUNT CHARGED BY THE ELECT RIC COMPANY THAT SER VES  Ch. 415 	2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
THE AREA WH ERE THE COMMUNITY SO LAR ENERGY GENERATIN G SYSTEM IS 
LOCATED; AND 
 
 (II) IS INSTALLED ON A RO OFTOP, PARKING FACILITY CAN OPY, 
OR BROWNFIELD . 
 
 (3) PERSONAL PROPERTY THA T RECEIVES AN EXEMPT ION UNDER 
THIS SUBSECTION IS E XEMPT FROM COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATION 
PROPERTY TAX FOR EAC H TAXABLE YEAR IN WH ICH THE PROPERTY CON TINUES TO 
MEET THE REQUIREMENT S FOR THE EXEMPTION UNDER PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS 
SUBSECTION. 
 
 (4) THE SUPERVISOR OF A C OUNTY OR A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION 
MAY NOT ACCEPT AN AP PLICATION FRO M A PROPERTY OWNER F OR THE EXEMPTION 
UNDER THIS SUBSECTIO N AFTER DECEMBER 31, 2024. 
 
 (5) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1 EACH YEAR, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL 
REPORT TO THE SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE AND THE HOUSE 
WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE 
GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, ON THE NUMBER AND LO CATION OF PROJECTS T HAT, IN 
THE IMMEDIATELY PREC EDING TAXABLE YEAR , HAVE RECEIVED THE EX EMPTION 
UNDER THIS SUBSECTIO N.  
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 2 of this Act shall b e 
applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022. 
 
 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 1 of this Act shall take 
effect July 1, 2022. 
 
 SECTION 5. 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That , except as provided in 
Section 4 of this Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2022, and shall be applicable to all 
taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.  
 
Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2022.