Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB76 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/19/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0076*  
  
HOUSE BILL 76 
Q1, Q7   	2lr1247 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 264 
By: Delegate Smith Delegates Smith, C. Branch, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, 
Palakovich Carr, and Wilkins 
Requested: November 1, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 13, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems – Exemption From Energy and 2 
Property Taxes 3 
 
FOR the purpose of exempting certain community solar energy generating systems from 4 
local energy taxes and personal property taxes; prohibiting the supervisor of a county 5 
or a municipal corporation from accepting applications for the exemption after a 6 
certain date; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to report 7 
annually certain information to certain committees of the General Assembly; and 8 
generally relating to tax exemptions an exemption from the personal property tax 9 
for community solar energy generating systems. 10 
 
BY adding to 11 
 Article – Local Government 12 
Section 20–203 to be under the amended subtitle “Subtitle 2. Limitations on 13 
Authority to Tax” 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2013 Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 17 
 Article – Tax – Property 18 
Section 7–237 19 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 21  2 	HOUSE BILL 76  
 
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 
 
Article – Local Government 3 
 
Subtitle 2. Limitations on Authority to Tax [Advertising]. 4 
 
20–203. 5 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 6 
INDICATED. 7 
 
 (2) “BROWNFIELD” MEANS: 8 
 
 (I) A FORMER INDUSTRIAL OR COMMERCIAL SITE I DENTIFIED 9 
BY FEDERAL OR STATE LAWS OR REGULAT IONS AS CONTAMINATED OR POLLUTED ;  10 
 
 (II) A CLOSED MUNICIPAL O R RUBBLE LANDFILL RE GULATED 11 
UNDER A REFUSE DISPO SAL PERMIT BY THE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF THE 12 
ENVIRONMENT ; OR  13 
 
 (III) MINED LANDS AS DEFIN ED IN COMAR 26.21.01.01.  14 
 
 (3) “COMMUNITY SOLAR ENERG Y GENERATING SYSTEM ” HAS THE 15 
MEANING STATED IN § 7–306.2 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 16 
 
 (4) “ELECTRIC COMPANY ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 1–101 OF 17 
THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 18 
 
 (B) NOTWITHSTANDING ANY O THER LAW, A TAX IMPOSED BY A P OLITICAL 19 
SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE ON THE SALE , USE, DELIVERY, DISTRIBUTION, 20 
PRODUCTION , OR CONSUMPTION OF EN ERGY DOES NOT APPLY TO ENERGY 21 
PRODUCED BY A COMMUNITY SOLAR ENER GY GENERATING SYSTEM THAT: 22 
 
 (1) PROVIDES AT LEAST 50% OF THE ENERGY IT PRO DUCES TO  23 
LOW– OR MODERATE –INCOME CUSTOMERS , AS DEFINED IN REGULA TIONS OF THE 24 
PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION, AT A COST THAT IS AT LEAST 20% LESS THAN THE 25 
AMOUNT CHA RGED BY THE ELECTRIC COMPANY THAT SERVES THE AREA WHERE 26 
THE COMMUNITY SOLAR ENERGY GENERATING SY STEM IS LOCATED ; AND 27 
 
 (2) IS INSTALLED ON A RO OFTOP, PARKING FACILITY CAN OPY, OR 28 
BROWNFIELD . 29 
   	HOUSE BILL 76 	3 
 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 1 
as follows: 2 
 
Article – Tax – Property 3 
 
7–237. 4 
 
 (a) Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, personal property is 5 
exempt from property tax if the property is machinery or equipment used to generate: 6 
 
 (1) electricity or steam for sale; or 7 
 
 (2) hot or chilled water for sale that is used to heat or cool a building. 8 
 
 (b) Subject to § 7–514 of this title, AND EXCEPT AS PROVID ED IN SUBSECTION 9 
(C) OF THIS SECTION , personal property that is machinery or equipment described in 10 
subsection (a) of this section is subject to county or municipal corporation property tax on: 11 
 
 (1) 75% of its value for the taxable year beginning July 1, 2000; and 12 
 
 (2) 50% of its value for the taxable year beginning July 1, 2001 and each 13 
subsequent taxable year. 14 
 
 (C) (1) (I) IN THIS SUBSECTION TH E FOLLOWING WORDS HA VE THE 15 
MEANINGS INDICATED . 16 
 
 (II) “BROWNFIELD” MEANS: 17 
 
 1. A FORMER INDUSTRIAL OR COMMERCIAL SITE 18 
IDENTIFIED BY FEDERA L OR STATE LAWS OR REGULAT IONS AS CONTAMINATED OR 19 
POLLUTED; OR  20 
 
 2. A CLOSED MUNICIPAL OR RUBBLE LANDFILL 21 
REGULATED UNDER A RE FUSE DISPOSAL PERMIT BY THE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT 22 
OF THE ENVIRONMENT ; OR. 23 
 
 3. MINED LANDS AS DEFIN ED IN COMAR 26.21.01.01.  24 
 
 (III) “COMMUNITY SOLAR ENERG Y GENERATING SYSTEM ” HAS 25 
THE MEANING STATED I N § 7–306.2 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 26 
 
 (IV) “ELECTRIC COMPANY ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN §  27 
1–101 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 28 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 76  
 
 
 (2) PERSONAL PROPERTY IS EXEMPT FROM COUNTY O R MUNICIPAL 1 
CORPORATION PROPERTY TAX IF THE PROPERTY IS MACHINERY OR E QUIPMENT 2 
THAT: 3 
 
 (I) AS DEFINED IN REGULA TION OF THE PUBLIC SERVICE 4 
COMMISSION, IS PART OF A COMMUNI TY SOLAR ENERGY GENE RATING SYSTEM 5 
THAT: 6 
 
 1. HAS A GENERATING CAP ACITY THAT DOES NOT 7 
EXCEED 2 MEGAWATTS AS MEASURE D BY THE ALTERNATING CURRENT RATING OF 8 
THE SYSTEM’S INVERTER; AND 9 
 
 2. PROVIDES AT LEAST 50% OF THE ENERGY IT 10 
PRODUCES TO LOW – OR MODERATE –INCOME CUSTOMERS , AS DEFINED IN 11 
REGULATIONS OF THE PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION, AT A COST THAT IS AT LEAST 12 
20% LESS THAN THE AMOUNT CHARGED BY THE ELECT RIC COMPANY THAT SER VES 13 
THE AREA WHERE THE C OMMUNITY SOLAR ENERG Y GENERATING SYSTEM IS 14 
LOCATED; AND 15 
 
 (II) IS INSTALLED ON A RO OFTOP, PARKING FACILITY CAN OPY, 16 
OR BROWNFIELD . 17 
 
 (3) PERSONAL PROPERTY THA T RECEIVES AN EXEMPT ION UNDER 18 
THIS SUBSECTION IS EXEMPT FROM COUNTY O R MUNICIPAL CORPORAT ION 19 
PROPERTY TAX FOR EAC H TAXABLE YEAR IN WH ICH THE PROPERTY CON TINUES TO 20 
MEET THE REQUIREMENT S FOR THE EXEMPTION UNDER PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS 21 
SUBSECTION. 22 
 
 (4) THE SUPERVISOR OF A C OUNTY OR A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION 23 
MAY NOT ACCEPT AN APP LICATION FROM A PROP ERTY OWNER FOR THE E XEMPTION 24 
UNDER THIS SUBSECTIO N AFTER DECEMBER 31, 2024. 25 
 
 (5) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1 EACH YEAR, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL 26 
REPORT TO THE SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE AND THE HOUSE 27 
WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE 28 
GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, ON THE NUMBER AND LO CATION OF PROJECTS T HAT, IN 29 
THE IMMEDIATELY PREC EDING TAXABLE YEAR , HAVE RECEIVED THE EX EMPTION 30 
UNDER THIS SUBSECTIO N.  31 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, Th at Section 2 of this Act shall be 32 
applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022. 33 
 
 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 1 of this Act shall take 34 
effect July 1, 2022. 35   	HOUSE BILL 76 	5 
 
 
 
 SECTION 5. 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That , except as provided in 1 
Section 4 of this Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2022, and shall be applicable to all 2 
taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.  3 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.