House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (134-3) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {503525/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |