House
|
05/27/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (92-41)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (29-13)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {783920/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {453023/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-28)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {793023/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-30)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {303226/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-28)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {463623/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {463623/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (96-40)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Floor Amendment {993527/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-94)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Floor Amendment {583026/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (40-95)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Floor Amendment {673124/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (40-94)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Floor Amendment {483024/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (41-93)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Floor Amendment {583423/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (40-93)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {773526/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Ways and Means
|
|
|