House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {823625/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |