Senate | 03/29/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (92-41) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {953322/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |