Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {313121/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/13/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {983129/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/27/2021 | Pre-filed |