Senate | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Pre-filed |