Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 306 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 306 | |
5 | - | (Senate Bill 144) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *sb0144* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Health – Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin – Repeal | |
10 | + | SENATE BILL 144 | |
11 | + | J1 2lr0533 | |
12 | + | (PRE–FILED) | |
13 | + | By: Senator Feldman | |
14 | + | Requested: September 22, 2021 | |
15 | + | Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 | |
16 | + | Assigned to: Finance | |
17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | + | Senate action: Adopted | |
19 | + | Read second time: February 17, 2022 | |
10 | 20 | ||
11 | - | FOR the purpose of repealing certain provisions of law relating to the prescription, | |
12 | - | administration, and regulation of amygdalin; and generally relating to amygdalin. | |
21 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
13 | 22 | ||
14 | - | BY repealing | |
15 | - | Article – Health – General | |
16 | - | Section 18–302 | |
17 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
18 | - | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) | |
23 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
19 | 24 | ||
20 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
21 | - | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: | |
25 | + | Health – Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin – Repeal 2 | |
22 | 26 | ||
23 | - | Article – Health – General | |
27 | + | FOR the purpose of repealing certain provisions of law relating to the prescription, 3 | |
28 | + | administration, and regulation of amygdalin; and generally relating to amygdalin. 4 | |
24 | 29 | ||
25 | - | [18–302. | |
30 | + | BY repealing 5 | |
31 | + | Article – Health – General 6 | |
32 | + | Section 18–302 7 | |
33 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 8 | |
34 | + | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 9 | |
26 | 35 | ||
27 | - | | |
28 | - | ||
36 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 | |
37 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 11 | |
29 | 38 | ||
30 | - | (b) (1) A hospital or health facility may not restrict or prohibit the use of | |
31 | - | amygdalin that a physician, with the consent of a patient, prescribes for or administers to | |
32 | - | the patient. | |
39 | + | Article – Health – General 12 | |
33 | 40 | ||
34 | - | (2) (i) The Department may restrict or prohibit the use of amygdalin in | |
35 | - | the treatment of a patient if, after a hearing, the Department finds that the manner in | |
36 | - | which the amygdalin is prescribed or administered is harmful to the patient. | |
41 | + | [18–302. 13 | |
37 | 42 | ||
38 | - | ( | |
39 | - | ||
43 | + | (a) Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, a physician may prescribe 14 | |
44 | + | or administer amygdalin to treat cancer. 15 | |
40 | 45 | ||
41 | - | ( | |
42 | - | ||
43 | - | ||
46 | + | (b) (1) A hospital or health facility may not restrict or prohibit the use of 16 | |
47 | + | amygdalin that a physician, with the consent of a patient, prescribes for or administers to 17 | |
48 | + | the patient. 18 2 SENATE BILL 144 | |
44 | 49 | ||
45 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect | |
46 | - | October 1, 2022. | |
47 | 50 | ||
48 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 12, 2022. | |
51 | + | ||
52 | + | (2) (i) The Department may restrict or prohibit the use of amygdalin in 1 | |
53 | + | the treatment of a patient if, after a hearing, the Department finds that the manner in 2 | |
54 | + | which the amygdalin is prescribed or administered is harmful to the patient. 3 | |
55 | + | ||
56 | + | (ii) The Department shall adopt rules and regulations for hearings 4 | |
57 | + | under this paragraph. 5 | |
58 | + | ||
59 | + | (c) The Department and the State Board of Pharmacy shall regulate the 6 | |
60 | + | manufacture, distribution, and sale of amygdalin for use in this State, but only to ensure 7 | |
61 | + | that the amygdalin is not adulterated, contaminated by microorganisms, or misbranded.] 8 | |
62 | + | ||
63 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 9 | |
64 | + | October 1, 2022. 10 | |
65 | + | ||
66 | + | ||
67 | + | ||
68 | + | Approved: | |
69 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
70 | + | Governor. | |
71 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
72 | + | President of the Senate. | |
73 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
74 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. |