Senate | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {813128/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {513022/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 01/08/2022 | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/14/2021 | Pre-filed |